H.B. No. 1949 AN ACT relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is amended to read as follows: (b) Not later than July 30, 2027 [2023], the commission shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees of the legislature. SECTION 2. Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 12.058. EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter expires December 31, 2027 [2023]. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1949 was passed by the House on April 20, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 26, 2 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 1949 was passed by the Senate on May 11, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor