Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1964 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez, Cain (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 1964
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 5, 2023;
 April 12, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the release of a motor vehicle accident report to an
 employee or authorized representative of a vehicle storage
 facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 550.065(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  On written request and payment of any required fee, the
 department or the governmental entity shall release the information
 to:
 (1)  an entity described by Subsection (b);
 (2)  the law enforcement agency that employs the peace
 officer who investigated the accident and sent the information to
 the department, including an agent of the law enforcement agency
 authorized by contract to obtain the information;
 (3)  the court in which a case involving a person
 involved in the accident is pending if the report is subpoenaed; or
 (4)  any person directly concerned in the accident or
 having a proper interest therein, including:
 (A)  any person involved in the accident;
 (B)  the authorized representative of any person
 involved in the accident;
 (C)  a driver involved in the accident;
 (D)  an employer, parent, or legal guardian of a
 driver involved in the accident;
 (E)  the owner of a vehicle or property damaged in
 the accident;
 (F)  a person who has established financial
 responsibility for a vehicle involved in the accident in a manner
 described by Section 601.051, including a policyholder of a motor
 vehicle liability insurance policy covering the vehicle;
 (G)  an insurance company that issued an insurance
 policy covering a vehicle involved in the accident;
 (H)  an insurance company that issued a policy
 covering any person involved in the accident;
 (I)  a person under contract to provide claims or
 underwriting information to a person described by Paragraph (F),
 (G), or (H);
 (J)  a radio or television station that holds a
 license issued by the Federal Communications Commission;
 (K)  a newspaper that is:
 (i)  a free newspaper of general circulation
 or qualified under Section 2051.044, Government Code, to publish
 legal notices;
 (ii)  published at least once a week; and
 (iii)  available and of interest to the
 general public in connection with the dissemination of news; [or]
 (L)  any person who may sue because of death
 resulting from the accident; or
 (M)  an employee or authorized representative of a
 vehicle storage facility, as defined by Section 2303.002,
 Occupations Code, that stored a vehicle involved in the accident.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *