Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1968 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris of Williamson H.B. No. 1968
 (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 35 in
 Williamson County as the Officer Charles Whites Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.217 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.217.  OFFICER CHARLES WHITES MEMORIAL HIGHWAY. (a)
 The portion of Interstate Highway 35 in Williamson County between
 its intersection with State Highway 45 and its intersection with
 Westinghouse Road is designated as the Officer Charles Whites
 Memorial Highway.  The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Officer Charles Whites Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *