Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2016 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2016
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 April 20, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility requirements for a license as a massage
 establishment, massage school, massage therapist, or massage
 therapy instructor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.152, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.152.  INELIGIBILITY FOR LICENSE. A person is not
 eligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage school,
 massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor if the person is
 an individual and has been convicted of, entered a plea of nolo
 contendere or guilty to, or received deferred adjudication for:
 (1)  an offense under Chapter 20A, Section 22.011 or
 22.021 [Penal Code], or Subchapter A, Chapter 43, Penal Code; [,] or
 (2)  another sexual offense.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *