Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2083 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Landgraf (Senate Sponsor - Sparks) H.B. No. 2083
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Business Interstate
 Highway 20-E in Ector County as the Mac Wilson and Rex Young Medal
 of Honor Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.217 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.217.  MAC WILSON AND REX YOUNG MEDAL OF HONOR
 HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of Business Interstate Highway 20-E in
 Ector County between its eastern intersection with State Highway
 Loop 338 and its intersection with the Ector-Midland County Line is
 designated as the Mac Wilson and Rex Young Medal of Honor Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Mac Wilson and Rex Young Medal of Honor Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *