Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2102 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 2102
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 18, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 3; May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a new open-enrollment charter
 school campus by certain charter holders and to the expansion of an
 open-enrollment charter school.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.101(b-10), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b-10)  The commissioner by rule shall allow a charter holder
 to provide written notice of the establishment of a new
 open-enrollment charter school campus under Subsection (b-4)(2) up
 to 36 [18] months before the date on which the campus is anticipated
 to open. Notice provided to the commissioner under this section
 does not obligate the charter holder to open a new campus.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.114(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  A charter holder may submit a request for approval for
 an expansion amendment up to 36 [18] months before the date on which
 the expansion will be effective.  A request for approval of an
 expansion amendment does not obligate the charter holder to
 complete the proposed expansion.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *