Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2166 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2023

                    By: Guerra, et al. (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia) H.B. No. 2166
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating March 4 as COVID-19 Heroes and Memorial
 Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.085.  COVID-19 HEROES AND MEMORIAL DAY. (a) March
 4 is COVID-19 Heroes and Memorial Day in honor of people who lost
 their lives to COVID-19 and in honor of health care workers, first
 responders, and other essential workers who kept working during the
 COVID-19 pandemic so the public could stay safe.
 (b)  COVID-19 Heroes and Memorial Day shall be regularly
 observed by appropriate ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *