Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2170 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guerra (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2170
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to toll collections by a toll project entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 372, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 372.0555 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.0555.  NOTICE OF RETURNED PAYMENT. A toll project
 entity must immediately notify the holder of an electronic toll
 collection customer account that a payment by the credit card or
 debit card associated with the account was declined or could not
 otherwise be processed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 372.056, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 372.056.  INFORMATION REQUIRED ON NOTICE OR INVOICE.
 (a) A notice or an invoice of unpaid tolls sent by a toll project
 entity must clearly state that the document is a bill and the
 recipient is expected to pay the amount indicated.
 (b)  A notice or an invoice of unpaid tolls sent by first
 class mail must clearly indicate on the outside of the envelope that
 the document enclosed is a bill and the recipient is expected to pay
 the amount indicated.
 SECTION 3.  Section 372.057(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An invoice or notice provided to a person by a toll
 project entity may be provided by:
 (1)  first class mail; [or]
 (2)  e-mail if the person has provided an e-mail
 address to the entity and has elected to receive notice
 electronically; or
 (3)  text message if the person has provided a phone
 number to the entity and has elected to receive notice by text
 message.
 SECTION 4.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to the collection of a toll incurred on or after the effective date
 of this Act. The collection of a toll incurred before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before
 the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *