Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2201 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

                    By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 2201
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 15, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to housing certain inmates in state jail felony
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 507.006(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 the state jail division, with the approval of the board, may
 designate one or more state jail felony facilities [or discrete
 areas within one or more state jail felony facilities] to treat
 inmates who are eligible for confinement in a substance abuse
 felony punishment facility under Section 493.009 or to house
 inmates who are sentenced to imprisonment in the institutional
 division, but only if the designation does not deny placement in a
 state jail felony facility of defendants required to serve terms of
 confinement in a facility following conviction of state jail
 felonies.  The division may not house in a state jail felony
 facility an inmate who:
 (1)  has a history of or has shown a pattern of violent
 or assaultive behavior in county jail or a facility operated by the
 department; or
 (2)  will increase the likelihood of harm to the public
 if housed in the facility.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *