H.B. No. 2285 AN ACT relating to the authority of certain independent school districts to change the terms for members of the districts' board of trustees. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 11.059, Education Code, is amended by adding Subsections (e), (f), and (g) to read as follows: (e) Not later than December 31, 2023, the board of trustees may adopt a resolution changing the length of the terms of its trustees. The resolution must provide for staggered terms of either three or four years and specify the manner in which the transition from the length of the former term to the modified term is made. The transition must begin with the first regular election for trustees that occurs after the board adopts the resolution, and a trustee who serves on the date the resolution is adopted shall serve the remainder of that term. (f) A resolution under Subsection (e) may only be adopted by a board of trustees of an independent school district: (1) with a central administrative office located in a county with a population of more than 1 million but less than 1.25 million; and (2) in which a municipality with a population of 4,500 or less is located. (g) Subsections (e) and (f) and this subsection expire January 1, 2029. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2285 was passed by the House on May 2, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 8, 3 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 2285 was passed by the Senate on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor