Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2373 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/09/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris of Anderson (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 2373
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 9, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of a water or sewer utility to consolidate
 more than one system under a single tariff.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 13.145, Water Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *