Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2453 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Parker) H.B. No. 2453
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2023;
 April 27, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 12, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 2; May 12, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a digital occupational license by a
 state agency, county, or municipality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 2, Occupations Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 60 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 60. DIGITAL LICENSES
 Sec. 60.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Licensing authority" means a state agency,
 county, or municipality that is authorized to issue an occupational
 license.
 (2)  "Occupational license" means a license,
 certificate, registration, permit, or other form of authorization
 required by statute, ordinance, order, or rule that must be
 obtained by an individual to engage in a particular business,
 occupation, or profession.
 Sec. 60.002.  REQUIREMENTS FOR DIGITAL LICENSES. A
 licensing authority that issues an occupational license may issue a
 digital license to a license holder. If the licensing authority
 issues a digital license, the digital license must comply with the
 following requirements:
 (1)  the digital license must be in a secure format and
 readily accessible by the license holder through an Internet
 website and on a wireless communication device;
 (2)  the public must be able to view a license holder's
 digital license through an Internet website or by using a QR code as
 defined by Section 443.001, Health and Safety Code; and
 (3)  if the authority contracts with a vendor for the
 issuance of a digital license, the digital license must be in a
 format in which the vendor and authority can verify the validity of
 the license.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *