Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2484 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

                    By: Guillen, et al. (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia) H.B. No. 2484
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 10, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0;
 May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2484 By:  Springer


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 CreightonX
 CampbellX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 FloresX
 KingX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 SpringerX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the safety of a referee, judge, or other official at
 certain public school extracurricular activities and competitions
 and prohibiting certain conduct by a spectator related to those
 officials' safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.081, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (f-1) and (f-2) and amending Subsection (g) to
 read as follows:
 (f-1)  A school district may prohibit a spectator of an
 extracurricular athletic activity or competition, including a
 parent or guardian of a student participant, from attending any
 future extracurricular athletic activity or competition sponsored
 or sanctioned by the school district or the University
 Interscholastic League if the spectator engages in conduct that
 intentionally, knowingly, or recklessly causes bodily injury to a
 person serving as referee, judge, or other official of an
 extracurricular athletic activity or competition in retaliation
 for or as a result of the person's actions taken in performing the
 duties of a referee, judge, or other official of the
 extracurricular athletic activity or competition.
 (f-2)  A school district may establish an appeals process by
 which a person may appeal to the district a prohibition imposed
 under Subsection (f-1).
 (g)  An appeal to the commissioner is not a contested case
 under Chapter 2001, Government Code, if the issues presented relate
 to a person's [student's] eligibility to participate in or attend an
 extracurricular activity [activities], including issues related to
 a [the] student's grades, the school district's grading policy as
 applied to a [the] student's eligibility, a [or the] student's
 eligibility based on conduct described by Subsection (e-1), or a
 spectator's eligibility to attend an extracurricular athletic
 activity or competition under Subsection (f-1).  The commissioner
 may delegate the matter for decision to a person the commissioner
 designates. The decision of the commissioner or the commissioner's
 designee in a matter governed by this subsection may not be appealed
 except on the grounds that the decision is arbitrary or capricious.
 Evidence may not be introduced on appeal other than the record of
 the evidence before the commissioner.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 33, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.099 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.099.  SAFETY OF OFFICIAL. A school district or
 open-enrollment charter school that holds an extracurricular
 athletic activity or a University Interscholastic League athletic
 competition on district or school property shall provide a peace
 officer, a school resource officer, an administrator, or security
 personnel to ensure the safety of a referee, judge, or other
 official of the activity or competition until the official departs
 district or school property if:
 (1)  a participant or spectator of the activity or
 competition engages in, attempts to engage in, or threatens violent
 conduct against the official or otherwise disrupts the duties or
 free movement of the official; or
 (2)  the district or school reasonably suspects that an
 incident described by Subdivision (1) may occur at the activity or
 competition.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *