Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2499 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bell of Montgomery (Senate Sponsor - Creighton) H.B. No. 2499
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating June 28 as Special Forces Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.085.  SPECIAL FORCES DAY. (a)  June 28 is Special
 Forces Day in honor of the men and women who have served in the
 special operations forces of the United States armed forces.
 (b)  Special Forces Day shall be regularly observed by
 appropriate ceremonies.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *