Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2503 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Lujan, Morales of Maverick H.B. No. 2503
 (Senate Sponsor - Flores)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for veterans
 with disabilities and recipients of the Texas Humanitarian Service
 Medal and federal Humanitarian Service Medal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e-1)  Other than license plates issued under Subsection
 (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on
 request:
 (1)  the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or
 (2)  one emblem from another license plate to which the
 person is entitled under Section 504.307, 504.308, 504.309,
 504.310(b), 504.311, 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315,
 504.316, 504.3161, 504.318, 504.319, 504.320, 504.323, 504.325,
 [or] 504.327, 504.331, or 504.332.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 504.331 and 504.332 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 504.331.  TEXAS HUMANITARIAN SERVICE MEDAL.  The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for recipients of
 the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal.  The license plates must
 include:
 (1)  the words "Texas Humanitarian Service Medal"; and
 (2)  a depiction of the Texas Humanitarian Service
 Medal emblem.
 Sec. 504.332.  FEDERAL HUMANITARIAN SERVICE MEDAL.  The
 department shall issue specialty license plates for recipients of
 the federal Humanitarian Service Medal.  The license plates must
 include:
 (1)  the words "Humanitarian Service Medal"; and
 (2)  a depiction of the federal Humanitarian Service
 Medal emblem.
 SECTION 3.  It is the intent of the 88th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2023, that the amendments made by this Act be harmonized
 with another Act of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *