Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2508 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/12/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jetton (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2508
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 4, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 12, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 12, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disbursement of money by a levee improvement
 district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 57, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 57.178 to read as follows:
 Sec. 57.178.  DISBURSEMENT OF DISTRICT MONEY. The board by
 resolution may allow:
 (1)  a bank in which the district deposits money to sign
 disbursements;
 (2)  the disbursement of district money to be
 transferred by Automated Clearing House (ACH); and
 (3)  the wire or electronic transfer of district money
 to vendors or other authorized accounts not in the name of the
 district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *