Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2626 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Tepper, Leach (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2626
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 PaxtonX
 BettencourtX
 BirdwellX
 LaMantiaX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 SchwertnerX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability on the Internet of certain reports of
 political contributions and expenditures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 254.0401, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (b), (e-1), and (h) to read as follows:
 (b)  The clerk or secretary of a political subdivision's
 governing body or, if the governing body does not have a clerk or
 secretary, the governing body's presiding officer shall make a
 report filed with the political subdivision by a candidate,
 officeholder, or specific-purpose committee under this subchapter
 available to the public on the political subdivision's Internet
 website not later than the 10th business day after the date the
 report is received.
 (e-1)  Before making a report available on the Internet as
 required by Subsection (b), the authority with whom the report is
 filed may remove each portion, other than city, state, and zip code,
 of the address of a person listed as having made a political
 contribution to the person filing the report. The address
 information removed must remain available on the report maintained
 in the authority's office.
 (h)  A report made available on an Internet website under
 this section must be accessible on that website until the fifth
 anniversary of the date the report is first made available.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions of the Election Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Sections 254.0401(a-1) and (c); and
 (2)  Section 254.04011.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a report under Chapter 254, Election Code, that is required to be
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A report under
 that chapter that is required to be filed before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the report
 is required to be filed, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *