Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB266 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/03/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Swanson (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 266
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 19, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 3, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 3, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 HughesX
 JohnsonX
 CreightonX
 HinojosaX
 MiddletonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the required filing and use of an affidavit containing
 the contact information of certain persons in a guardianship
 proceeding.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 1101, Estates Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1101.003 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1101.003.  AFFIDAVIT CONTAINING CONTACT INFORMATION OF
 CERTAIN PERSONS. (a)  Within the time prescribed by the court, a
 person who files an application under Section 1101.001 shall file
 an affidavit with the court that states the name, address,
 telephone number, e-mail address, and other contact information if
 known by the applicant for each person entitled to notice under
 Section 1051.104(a).
 (b)  An affidavit filed under this section is privileged and
 confidential. The affidavit may not be released or otherwise
 disclosed to the public.
 (c)  On qualification of a guardian, the court shall provide
 a copy of the affidavit filed under this section to the guardian if
 the guardian is not the person who filed the affidavit.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1151.056, Estates Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  Unless the guardian knows the information is not
 correct, a guardian of a ward shall rely on the contact information
 contained in the affidavit required by Section 1101.003 to provide
 notice about the ward to a relative of the ward under this section.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an application for the appointment of a guardian filed on or after
 the effective date of this Act.  An application for the appointment
 of a guardian filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the application was filed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *