Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2754 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Bell of Montgomery (Senate Sponsor - King) H.B. No. 2754
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for retired
 peace officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.5111 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.5111.  RETIRED PEACE OFFICERS. (a)  In this
 section, "retired peace officer" means a person who was formerly
 employed as a peace officer, as defined by Section 1.07, Penal Code.
 (b)  The department shall design and issue specialty license
 plates for retired peace officers.
 (c)  There is no fee for the issuance of the license plates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *