Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2876 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Cain, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 2876
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for industrial
 firefighters; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.517 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.517.  INDUSTRIAL FIREFIGHTERS. (a) The department
 shall design and issue specialty license plates for industrial
 firefighters certified by the State Firefighters' and Fire
 Marshals' Association of Texas.
 (b)  The fee for issuance of the license plates is $30.
 (c)  A person may be issued not more than three sets of
 license plates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *