Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2878 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Capriglione (Senate Sponsor - Parker) H.B. No. 2878
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation in certain counties of mobile food
 service establishments in more than one municipality within the
 county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 6, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 437A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 437A. MOBILE FOOD SERVICE ESTABLISHMENTS OPERATING IN
 CERTAIN COUNTIES IN MORE THAN ONE MUNICIPALITY
 Sec. 437A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Food," "mobile food unit," and "roadside food
 vendor" have the meanings assigned by rules adopted under Chapter
 437.
 (2)  "Mobile food service establishment" means one or
 more mobile food units or roadside food vendors operating from a
 single preparation facility under the managerial authority of a
 single permit or license holder.
 Sec. 437A.002.  APPLICABILITY. This chapter applies only to
 a county:
 (1)  with a population of more than 2.1 million; and
 (2)  in which is located partly or wholly:
 (A)  an airport operating under Subchapter D,
 Chapter 22, Transportation Code; and
 (B)  an airport owned by the principal
 municipality in the county that does not offer commercial air
 service.
 Sec. 437A.003.  COUNTY PERMIT REQUIRED. (a)
 Notwithstanding any other law, a mobile food service establishment
 may not operate in a county to which this chapter applies unless the
 establishment obtains a permit from the county.
 (b)  A permit issued by a county under this chapter must
 authorize a mobile food service establishment to operate in any
 municipality located in the county.
 (c)  A permit issued by a county under this chapter is
 considered a permit issued by a county under Chapter 437 for
 purposes of that chapter.
 Sec. 437A.004.  COUNTY RESPONSE TO PERMIT APPLICATION. A
 county shall approve or deny a mobile food service establishment's
 application for a permit to operate in the county not later than the
 third business day after the date the county receives the
 application and all information necessary for the county to
 consider the application.
 Sec. 437A.005.  REFUSAL TO ISSUE PERMIT. (a) A county may
 refuse to issue a permit for a mobile food service establishment to
 operate in the county if the establishment is not in good standing
 in another jurisdiction or if the county has previously imposed on
 the establishment a citation or fine that raises public health and
 safety concerns.
 (b)  If a county refuses to issue a permit authorizing a
 mobile food service establishment to operate in the county, the
 county shall provide the establishment with written notice
 regarding the basis for the county's refusal and advise the
 establishment of any remedial actions the establishment may take to
 become eligible for a permit.
 Sec. 437A.006.  INSPECTION BY COUNTY. (a) A mobile food
 service establishment is subject to periodic and unannounced
 inspections by the county that issues the permit to operate in the
 county under this chapter.
 (b)  A mobile food service establishment shall allow the
 county access to the establishment for an inspection.
 (c)  If an inspection by the county determines a mobile food
 service establishment committed a violation, the county may issue a
 fine to the establishment or suspend the establishment's permit.
 Sec. 437A.007.  PERMIT RENEWAL; NOTICE. A mobile food
 service establishment annually shall renew the establishment's
 permit under this chapter.
 Sec. 437A.008.  RULES. The executive commissioner may adopt
 the rules necessary to implement this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *