Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2947 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

                    By: Cain (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 2947
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 PerryX
 HancockX
 BlancoX
 FloresX
 GutierrezX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 SparksX
 SpringerX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of agricultural operations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 251.002(1), Agriculture Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (1)  "Agricultural operation" includes the following
 activities:
 (A)  cultivating the soil;
 (B)  producing crops for human food, animal feed,
 planting seed, or fiber;
 (C)  floriculture;
 (D)  viticulture;
 (E)  horticulture;
 (F)  silviculture;
 (G)  wildlife management;
 (H)  raising or keeping livestock or poultry;
 [and]
 (I)  planting cover crops or leaving land idle for
 the purpose of participating in any governmental program or normal
 crop or livestock rotation procedure; and
 (J) the commercial sale of animals, as defined by
 Section 252.001 of this code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *