Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2969 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

                    By: Cook, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2969
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 18, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting a maximum age or age differential for
 prospective adoptive parents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 162, Family Code, is
 amended by adding Section 162.604 to read as follows:
 Sec. 162.604.  MAXIMUM AGE RESTRICTION FOR ADOPTIVE PARENTS
 PROHIBITED. (a)  The Department of Family and Protective Services,
 a single source continuum contractor, or a licensed child-placing
 agency that places a child for adoption may not implement or enforce
 a policy that:
 (1)  sets a maximum age for any prospective adoptive
 parent; or
 (2)  sets a maximum age differential between a child
 and any prospective adoptive parent.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (a), the Department of Family and
 Protective Services, a single source continuum contractor, or a
 licensed child-placing agency may consider the health and expected
 lifespan of each prospective adoptive parent when determining the
 best interest of a child.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *