Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3014 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Harris of Williamson H.B. No. 3014
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the motor vehicle safety inspection of electric
 vehicles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 548.051, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A motor vehicle that uses electricity as its only source
 of motor power and that is not equipped with an internal combustion
 engine is exempt from the inspection requirements relating to the
 emissions and exhaust systems provided in Subsections
 (a)(12)-(15).
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the public safety director of the Department of Public
 Safety shall adopt or amend department rules as necessary to
 implement the provisions of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 offense committed before the effective date of this Act is governed
 by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *