Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3053 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/28/2023

                    By: Dean H.B. No. 3053


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the municipal disannexation of areas annexed during a
 certain period of time.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 43, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 43.1463 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.1463.  DISANNEXATION OF AREAS ANNEXED DURING
 TRANSITION FROM NONCONSENT TO CONSENT ANNEXATION MODEL. (a) This
 section applies only to an area for which annexation was finalized
 between March 3, 2015, and December 1, 2017.
 (b)  On November 7, 2023, a municipality shall hold an
 election in an area described by Subsection (a) on the question of
 disannexing the area from the municipality. The municipality:
 (1)  may not use public money on promotional campaigns
 or advocacy related to the election; and
 (2)  shall ensure that the ballot proposition for the
 election:
 (A)  describes the area to be disannexed;
 (B)  identifies the area by the commonly used name
 of the area, if applicable;
 (C)  identifies the entities that will provide law
 enforcement, fire, and emergency services after disannexation;
 (D)  describes the effect of disannexation on ad
 valorem taxes and fees in the area; and
 (E)  describes the effect of disannexation on
 special districts located in the area.
 (c)  A municipality shall disannex an area described by
 Subsection (a), including residential and commercial property in
 the area, if the voters approve the disannexation in the election
 held under Subsection (b).
 (d)  A municipality shall retain ownership of any
 infrastructure, including a water treatment and storage facility,
 transferred to the municipality from a special district as part of
 the annexation of an area disannexed under this section.
 (e)  After an area is disannexed under this section:
 (1)  a special district located in and serving the area
 may be dissolved only if the members of the governing body of the
 district elect to dissolve the district after the disannexation;
 and
 (2)  an emergency services district located in or
 adjacent to the area shall provide services to the area.
 (f)  A disannexation under this section does not authorize
 the impairment of a municipal debt obligation and, to the extent
 applicable, the area is not released from its pro rata share of that
 indebtedness. The municipality shall continue to impose a property
 tax each year on the property in the area at the same rate that is
 imposed on other property in the municipality until the taxes
 collected from the area equal its pro rata share of the
 indebtedness. Those taxes may be charged only with the cost of
 imposing and collecting the taxes, and the taxes shall be applied
 exclusively to the payment of the pro rata share of the
 indebtedness. This subsection does not prevent the inhabitants of
 the area from paying in full at any time their pro rata share of the
 indebtedness.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.