Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3106 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2023

                    By: Hefner (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3106
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; April 26, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 49 in
 Titus County as the Titus County WWI Veterans Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.1685 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.1685.  TITUS COUNTY WWI VETERANS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of State Highway 49 in Titus County between the
 eastern municipal limits of Mount Pleasant and its intersection
 with Farm-to-Market Road 2348 is designated as the Titus County WWI
 Veterans Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Titus County WWI Veterans Memorial Highway and
 any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *