Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3108 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/26/2023

                    By: Hefner (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3108
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; April 26, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm to Market Road 2348
 in Titus County as the Army Staff Sergeant Clay Allen Craig Memorial
 Bridge.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.217 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.217.  ARMY STAFF SERGEANT CLAY ALLEN CRAIG MEMORIAL
 BRIDGE. (a) The Farm to Market Road 2348 bridge in Titus County
 that is located on the portion of Farm to Market Road 2348 between
 State Highway 49 and United States Highway 67 is designated as the
 Army Staff Sergeant Clay Allen Craig Memorial Bridge.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Army Staff Sergeant Clay Allen Craig Memorial
 Bridge and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the bridge.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *