Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3265 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/18/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Manuel (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 3265
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 18, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 1; May 18, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the submission of certain reports by the Health and
 Human Services Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 531.06021(b), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The [Not later than the 30th day after the last day of
 each state fiscal quarter, the] commission shall submit to the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of
 representatives, the Legislative Budget Board, and each standing
 legislative committee with primary jurisdiction over Medicaid a
 semiannual report containing, for the preceding six-month period
 [most recent state fiscal quarter], the following information and
 data related to access to care for Medicaid recipients receiving
 benefits under the medically dependent children (MDCP) waiver
 program:
 (1)  enrollment in the Medicaid buy-in for children
 program implemented under Section 531.02444;
 (2)  [requests relating to interest list placements
 under Section 531.0601;
 [(3)]  use of the Medicaid escalation help line
 established under Section 533.00253[, if the help line was
 operational during the applicable state fiscal quarter];
 (3) [(4)]  use of, requests for, and outcomes of the
 external medical review procedure established under Section
 531.024164; and
 (4) [(5)]  complaints relating to the medically
 dependent children (MDCP) waiver program, categorized by
 disposition.
 SECTION 2.  Section 536.003(g), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (g)  The commission shall include aggregate, nonidentifying
 data collected using the quality-based outcome measure described by
 Subsection (f) in the biennial [annual] report required by Section
 536.008 and may include the data in any other report required by
 this chapter.  The commission shall determine the appropriateness
 of including the quality-based outcome measure described by
 Subsection (f) in the quality-based payments and payment systems
 developed under Sections 536.004 and 536.051.
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 536.008, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 536.008.  BIENNIAL [ANNUAL] REPORT.
 SECTION 4.  Section 536.008(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall submit to the legislature and make
 available to the public a biennial [an annual] report regarding:
 (1)  the quality-based outcome and process measures
 developed under Section 536.003, including measures based on each
 potentially preventable event; and
 (2)  the progress of the implementation of
 quality-based payment systems and other payment initiatives
 implemented under this chapter.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 32.155(d) and (e), Health and Safety
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d)  The commission shall prepare and submit to the
 legislature and make available to the public a biennial [an annual]
 report that summarizes:
 (1)  the commission's progress in developing or
 enhancing initiatives under this section; and
 (2)  each managed care organization's progress in
 incorporating the required initiatives in the organization's
 managed care plans.
 (e)  The commission shall [may] submit the report required
 under Subsection (d) with the report required under Section
 536.008, Government Code.
 SECTION 6.  Section 255.005, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 255.005.  BIENNIAL REPORT.  (a) The Health and Human
 Services Commission [department] shall assess and evaluate the
 effectiveness of the quality assurance early warning system and
 shall report its findings biennially [annually] to the governor,
 the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 (b)  The Health and Human Services Commission shall submit
 the report required under this section with the report required
 under Section 536.008, Government Code.
 SECTION 7.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *