Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB33 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Landgraf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 33
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 19, 2023, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 3, one present not voting; May 19, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 33 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of certain federal laws regulating oil
 and gas operations within the State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 3, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 82 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 82. ENFORCEMENT OF FEDERAL LAWS
 Sec. 82.0101.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "oil and gas
 operation" has the meaning assigned by Section 81.0523.
 Sec. 82.0102.  ENFORCEMENT OF CERTAIN FEDERAL LAWS
 REGULATING OIL AND GAS OPERATIONS. (a) An agency of this state or a
 person employed by an agency of this state may not contract with or
 in any other manner provide assistance to a federal agency or
 official with respect to the enforcement of a federal statute,
 order, rule, or regulation purporting to regulate oil and gas
 operations if the statute, order, rule, or regulation imposes a
 prohibition, restriction, or other regulation that does not exist
 under the laws of this state.
 (b)  The attorney general shall defend any agency of this
 state that the federal government attempts to sue for an action or
 omission consistent with the requirements of this section.
 (c)  This section does not prohibit a state agency from:
 (1)  implementing a federal law by executing authority
 delegated to the state agency by a federal agency; or
 (2)  entering into a memorandum of understanding with a
 federal agency to implement a federal law, if otherwise authorized
 by state law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *