Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3313 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Ordaz (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 3313
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 NicholsX
 WestX
 AlvaradoX
 EckhardtX
 HancockX
 KingX
 MilesX
 ParkerX
 PerryX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on motorcycles
 and mopeds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 547.306(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A person may operate a motorcycle or moped equipped with
 LED ground effect lighting only if the lighting [that] emits a
 non-flashing amber or white light, and no other type of light.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *