Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB340 Introduced / Bill

Filed 11/14/2022

                    88R267 MEW-F
 By: Thompson of Harris H.B. No. 340


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement and study of insurance coverage for
 serious emotional disturbance of a child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1355.001, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Serious emotional disturbance of a child" means
 an emotional or behavioral disorder or a neuropsychiatric condition
 that causes a person's functioning to be impaired in thought,
 perception, affect, or behavior and that:
 (A)  has been diagnosed or identified, as
 applicable, in a person who is at least three years of age and
 younger than 18 years of age by:
 (i)  a physician licensed to practice
 medicine in this state and practicing within the scope of the
 physician's license; or
 (ii)  a psychologist, licensed professional
 counselor, licensed marriage and family therapist, or licensed
 clinical social worker licensed to practice in this state and
 practicing within the scope of the applicable license; and
 (B)  meets at least one of the following criteria:
 (i)  the disorder or condition substantially
 impairs the person's ability in at least two of the following
 activities or tasks:
 (a)  self-care;
 (b)  engaging in family relationships;
 (c)  functioning in school; or
 (d)  functioning in the community;
 (ii)  the disorder or condition creates a
 risk that the person will be removed from the person's home and
 placed in a more restrictive environment, including in a facility
 or program operated by the Department of Family and Protective
 Services or an agency that is part of the juvenile justice system;
 (iii)  the disorder or condition causes the
 person to:
 (a)  display psychotic features or
 violent behavior; or
 (b)  pose a danger to the person's self
 or others; or
 (iv)  the disorder or condition results in
 the person meeting state special education eligibility
 requirements for emotional disturbance.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 1355, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1355.0041 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.0041.  REQUIRED COVERAGE FOR SERIOUS EMOTIONAL
 DISTURBANCE OF A CHILD. (a) Notwithstanding Section 1355.002, this
 section does not apply to:
 (1)  a basic plan under Chapter 1575; or
 (2)  a primary care coverage plan under Chapter 1579.
 (b)  A group health benefit plan:
 (1)  must provide coverage for serious emotional
 disturbance of a child, based on medical necessity, for not less
 than the following treatments in each calendar year:
 (A)  45 days of inpatient treatment; and
 (B)  60 visits for outpatient treatment,
 including group and individual outpatient treatment;
 (2)  may not include a lifetime limitation on the
 number of days of inpatient treatment or the number of visits for
 outpatient treatment covered under the plan; and
 (3)  must include the same amount limitations,
 deductibles, copayments, and coinsurance factors for serious
 emotional disturbance of a child as the plan includes for physical
 illness.
 (c)  A group health benefit plan issuer:
 (1)  may not count an outpatient visit for medication
 management against the number of outpatient visits required to be
 covered under Subsection (b)(1)(B); and
 (2)  must provide coverage for an outpatient visit
 described by Subsection (b)(1)(B) under the same terms as the
 coverage the issuer provides for an outpatient visit for the
 treatment of physical illness.
 (d)  The department shall conduct a study to determine and
 evaluate the extent to which enrollees are making claims under
 coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a child and the
 impact, if any, the coverage for serious emotional disturbance of a
 child and the claims have on the cost of the coverage for group
 health benefit plans.
 (e)  Not later than August 1, 2024, the department shall
 submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the appropriate standing committees
 of the legislature a report regarding the results of the study
 required by Subsection (d), together with any recommendations for
 legislation.
 (f)  This subsection and Subsections (d) and (e) expire
 September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 1355.005 and 1355.007, Insurance Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1355.005.  MANAGED CARE PLAN AUTHORIZED. A group
 health benefit plan issuer may provide or offer coverage required
 by Section 1355.004 or 1355.0041 through a managed care plan.
 Sec. 1355.007.  SMALL EMPLOYER COVERAGE. An issuer of a
 group health benefit plan to a small employer must offer the
 coverage described by Section 1355.004 or 1355.0041 to the employer
 but is not required to provide the coverage if the employer rejects
 the coverage.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1355.054(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  Benefits of coverage provided under this subchapter may
 be used only in a situation in which:
 (1)  the covered individual has a serious mental
 illness or serious emotional disturbance of a child as defined by
 Section 1355.001 that requires confinement of the individual in a
 hospital unless treatment is available through a residential
 treatment center for children and adolescents or a crisis
 stabilization unit; and
 (2)  the covered individual's mental illness or
 emotional disturbance:
 (A)  substantially impairs the individual's
 thought, perception of reality, emotional process, or judgment; or
 (B)  as manifested by the individual's recent
 disturbed behavior, grossly impairs the individual's behavior.
 SECTION 5.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a group health benefit plan that is delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024. A group health
 benefit plan that is delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed
 before January 1, 2024, is governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.