Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3437 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2023

                    By: Holland (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3437
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 9, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 9, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority to approve change orders for certain
 contracts for the construction, repair, and renovation of water
 district facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 49.273(i), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (i)  If changes in plans, specifications, or scope of work
 are necessary or beneficial to the district, as determined by the
 board, after the performance of the contract is begun, or if it is
 necessary or beneficial to the district, as determined by the
 board, to decrease or increase the quantity of the work to be
 performed or of the materials, equipment, or supplies to be
 furnished, the board may approve change orders making the changes.
 The board may grant authority to an official or employee
 responsible for purchasing or for administering a contract to
 approve a change order that involves an increase or decrease of
 $150,000 [$50,000] or less.  The aggregate of the change orders that
 increase the original contract price by more than 25 percent may be
 issued only as a result of unanticipated conditions encountered
 during construction, repair, or renovation or changes in regulatory
 criteria or to facilitate project coordination with other political
 entities.  A change order is not subject to the requirements of
 Subsection (d) or (e).
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a change order approved on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A change order approved before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the change order was
 approved, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *