Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3613 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Cain (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 3613
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 16, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Local
 Government; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BettencourtX
 SpringerX
 EckhardtX
 GutierrezX
 HallX
 NicholsX
 ParkerX
 PaxtonX
 WestX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the election of the entire governing body of a
 municipality following each apportionment.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Local Government Code,
 is amended by adding Section 21.006 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.006.  ELECTION OF ENTIRE GOVERNING BODY UPON
 APPORTIONMENT. (a)  A municipality that is divided into districts,
 wards, or other areas from which members of its governing body are
 elected shall elect all members of the municipality's governing
 body following each apportionment on the first uniform election
 date that allows sufficient time to comply with any requirements of
 law.
 (b)  If members of the governing body of a municipality
 described by Subsection (a) serve staggered terms, the municipality
 shall adopt an equitable process to determine which members of the
 governing body serve shorter terms to accommodate an election
 following apportionment that accounts for the remaining time in
 each member's term and whether the term of any member elected from a
 particular district, ward, or area was previously shortened under
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *