Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3636 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/06/2023

                    88R10191 BDP-D
 By: Goodwin H.B. No. 3636


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain
 benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas and a study
 on the feasibility of providing annual adjustments and an optional
 cash balance benefit under the system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 824, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 824.703 to read as follows:
 Sec. 824.703.  ADDITIONAL COST-OF-LIVING ADJUSTMENT.
 (a)  Notwithstanding Section 824.702 and subject to Section
 821.006, the retirement system shall make a one-time cost-of-living
 adjustment payable to annuitants receiving a monthly death or
 retirement benefit annuity, as provided by this section.
 (b)  Subject to Subsections (c) and (d), to be eligible for
 the adjustment, a person must be, on the effective date of the
 adjustment and disregarding any forfeiture of benefits under
 Section 824.601, an annuitant eligible to receive:
 (1)  a standard service or disability retirement
 annuity payment;
 (2)  an optional service or disability retirement
 annuity payment as either a retiree or beneficiary;
 (3)  an annuity payment under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
 (4);
 (4)  an annuity payment under Section 824.502; or
 (5)  an alternate payee annuity payment under Section
 804.005.
 (c)  If the annuitant:
 (1)  is a retiree or is a beneficiary under an optional
 retirement payment plan, to be eligible for the adjustment under
 this section:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the effective
 date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the effective date of the retirement of the
 member of the retirement system must have been on or before August
 31, 2020;
 (2)  is a beneficiary under Section 824.402(a)(3) or
 (4) or 824.502, to be eligible for the adjustment:
 (A)  the annuitant must be living on the effective
 date of the adjustment; and
 (B)  the date of death of the member of the
 retirement system must have been on or before August 31, 2020; or
 (3)  is an alternate payee under Section 804.005, the
 annuitant is eligible for the adjustment only if the effective date
 of the election to receive the annuity payment was on or before
 August 31, 2020.
 (d)  An adjustment made under this section does not apply to
 payments under:
 (1)  Section 824.203(d), relating to retirees who
 receive a standard service retirement annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute;
 (2)  Section 824.304(a), relating to disability
 retirees with less than 10 years of service credit;
 (3)  Section 824.304(b)(2), relating to disability
 retirees who receive a disability annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute;
 (4)  Section 824.404(a), relating to active member
 survivor beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount
 fixed by statute;
 (5)  Section 824.501(a), relating to retiree survivor
 beneficiaries who receive a survivor annuity in an amount fixed by
 statute; or
 (6)  Section 824.804(b), relating to participants in
 the deferred retirement option plan with regard to payments from
 their deferred retirement option plan accounts.
 (e)  An adjustment under this section:
 (1)  must be made beginning with an annuity payable for
 the month of September 2023; and
 (2)  is limited to an amount equal to six percent of the
 monthly benefit subject to the increase.
 (f)  The board of trustees shall determine the eligibility
 for and the amount of any adjustment in monthly annuities in
 accordance with this section.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  In this section, "retirement system" means
 Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
 (b)  The State Pension Review Board shall conduct a study on
 the feasibility of the retirement system:
 (1)  providing an annual cost-of-living adjustment to
 annuitants receiving a monthly death or retirement benefit annuity
 under Chapter 824, Government Code; and
 (2)  offering members of the retirement system a choice
 of continuing to receive benefits under the existing defined
 benefit plan under an analysis that assumes a rate of return of six
 percent or a cash balance benefit plan under an analysis that
 assumes adoption of a cash balance benefit plan that is similar in
 design and cost structure to the cash balance benefit plan
 established under Chapter 820, Government Code, except that the
 State Pension Review Board should evaluate the difference between
 offering a cash balance benefit plan that provides a retirement
 eligibility age of 62 and a plan that provides a retirement
 eligibility age of 67.
 (c)  In conducting the study, the State Pension Review Board
 shall:
 (1)  assume the annual state contribution rate will
 increase over specific periods of time, including periods of 4
 years, 8 years, 12 years, and 16 years, in an amount sufficient to
 pre-fund the amount necessary to provide the annual cost-of-living
 adjustments;
 (2)  assume the annual cost-of-living adjustment will
 be the lesser of:
 (A)  a percentage rate equal to the percentage
 increase, if any, during the preceding state fiscal year in the
 Consumer Price Index that is used by the comptroller of public
 accounts; or
 (B)  three percent;
 (3)  determine the additional state and employee
 contribution rates necessary to provide:
 (A)  an annual cost-of-living adjustment for
 retirees, including retirees who have resumed employment with a
 Texas public educational institution, as described by Section
 824.601(c), Government Code;
 (B)  an opt-in cost-of-living adjustment for
 retirees, including retirees who have resumed employment with a
 Texas public educational institution, as described by Section
 824.601(c), Government Code;
 (C)  a transitional system developed by the
 retirement system under which:
 (i)  current and future annuitants of the
 retirement system automatically receive cost-of-living adjustments
 that have been pre-funded by the state; and
 (ii)  current members or annuitants of the
 retirement system can opt in to or opt out of the transitional
 system with the understanding that opting out allows the member or
 annuitant to remain under the current system with no guaranteed
 cost-of-living adjustments; and
 (D)  any other alternative benefit adjustment
 that the retirement system determines is feasible to provide the
 best retirement benefits to annuitants;
 (4)  when calculating the state contribution rates
 under this subsection, show what the cost would be over the periods
 of time specified in Subdivision (1) using varying assumed rates of
 return, including 5.5, 6, 6.5, and 7 percent;
 (5)  when calculating contribution rate increases,
 show how much the employer and member contributions would need to
 increase if the state contribution rate is limited to 10 percent;
 (6)  explore various cost-sharing options, including
 at least one option that does not require members of the retirement
 system to contribute any additional contributions necessary to
 pre-fund amounts needed to provide annual cost-of-living
 adjustments; and
 (7)  solicit input and feedback from the public and
 other interested persons.
 (d)  Not later than December 31, 2024, the State Pension
 Review Board shall submit to the legislature a written report on the
 results of the study and any recommendations for legislative
 action.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2025.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.