Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3643 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - King) H.B. No. 3643
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 April 25, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a temporary license by the Department of
 Public Safety.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.124, Transportation Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *