Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3647 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - LaMantia) H.B. No. 3647
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 April 25, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the imposition by the Department of Public Safety of
 administrative and civil consequences for certain criminal
 convictions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.042, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (f) and (g) to read as follows:
 (f)  Except as provided by Subsection (g), the department may
 not consider a record of a conviction of a license holder that is
 received by the department after the first anniversary of the date
 of the conviction in a decision to impose an enforcement action
 against the license holder, including a decision to suspend,
 revoke, or deny renewal of the license holder's driver's license.
 (g)  The department may consider a record of a conviction of
 a license holder that is received by the department after the first
 anniversary of the date of the conviction in a decision to impose an
 enforcement action against the license holder if:
 (1)  the license holder:
 (A)  is a commercial driver's license holder or
 was a commercial driver's license holder at the time of the offense;
 (B)  was operating a commercial motor vehicle at
 the time of the offense; or
 (C)  was operating a motor vehicle and
 transporting a hazardous material at the time of the offense; or
 (2)  the conviction is for an offense under Chapter 49,
 Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *