Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB367 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Jetton (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 367
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 12, 2023;
 April 18, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the State Commission on
 Judicial Conduct.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 33, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 33.02105 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.02105.  CANDIDATE FOR JUDICIAL OFFICE. The
 commission may accept complaints, conduct investigations, and take
 any other action authorized by this chapter or Section 1-a, Article
 V, Texas Constitution, with respect to a candidate for judicial
 office who is subject to Subchapter F, Chapter 253, Election Code,
 in the same manner the commission is authorized to take those
 actions with respect to a judge.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *