Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3712 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3712
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2023;
 May 5, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 8, Nays 1; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing a holder of a distributor's license to
 provide samples of malt beverages to retailers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 102.02, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 102.02.  PROVIDING SAMPLES.  (a) Notwithstanding any
 other provision of this code, the holder of a wholesaler's permit or
 distributor's license or the holder's agent, representative, or
 employee may furnish or give a sample of liquor or malt beverages to
 a holder of a permit or license authorizing the sale of that
 category of alcoholic beverage at retail if the retail permittee or
 licensee has not previously purchased that brand from that
 wholesaler permittee or distributor licensee.
 (b)  The liquor or malt beverages provided as a sample under
 Subsection (a) [wholesaler] may [give the retail permittee] not be
 more than:
 (1)  750 milliliters of any brand of distilled spirits;
 (2)  [, not more than] three liters of any brand of
 wine; and
 (3)  72 ounces [in that package, and not more than one
 six-pack] of any brand of malt [other alcoholic] beverage [so
 packaged].
 (c)  The holder of a retail permit or license authorizing the
 sale of liquor or malt beverages [permittee] or the permittee's or
 licensee's agent, servant, or employee may sample the alcoholic
 beverage provided under Subsection (a) [the product] on the
 permitted or licensed retail [licensed] premises only if:
 (1)  the holder of the wholesaler's permit or
 distributor's license is present; [wholesaler] or
 (2)  the wholesaler's or distributor's agent, servant,
 or employee is present.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *