Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3843 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wilson H.B. No. 3843


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study and report by the Texas A&M Transportation
 Institute regarding toll project entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  DEFINITIONS. In this Act:
 (1)  "Institute" means the Texas A&M Transportation
 Institute.
 (2)  "Toll project" has the meaning assigned by Section
 201.001(b), Transportation Code.
 (3)  "Toll project entity" means an entity that
 operates a toll project, including:
 (A)  the Texas Department of Transportation under
 Chapter 228, Transportation Code;
 (B)  a regional tollway authority under Chapter
 366, Transportation Code;
 (C)  a regional mobility authority under Chapter
 370, Transportation Code; or
 (D)  a county under Chapter 284, Transportation
 Code.
 SECTION 2.  STUDY. (a) The institute shall conduct a study
 comparing the practices and operations of toll project entities
 statewide.
 (b)  The study must include a comparison of:
 (1)  toll operations;
 (2)  error rates;
 (3)  customer complaints and case escalations;
 (4)  speed of processing;
 (5)  billing practices; and
 (6)  any other factors the institute deems appropriate.
 (c)  Not later than May 1, 2024, each toll project entity
 shall submit to the institute the entity's comments on best
 practices for and challenges experienced with the matters listed in
 Subsection (b) of this section and any other matter that presents a
 challenge to the entity in the operation of a toll project.  The
 institute shall incorporate the comments into the report required
 by Section 3 of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2024, the
 institute shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor,
 and the legislature a written report of the findings of the study.
 SECTION 4.  EXPIRATION DATE. This Act expires May 1, 2025.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023.