Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3929 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Cook, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3929
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the adoption by the Supreme Court of Texas of the
 Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Before September 1, 2025, the Supreme Court of
 Texas may adopt the Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery
 Act as rules of civil procedure.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Effective September 1, 2025, Section 20.002,
 Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is repealed.
 (b)  If the Supreme Court of Texas adopts the rules described
 by Section 1 of this Act with an effective date before September 1,
 2025, those rules supersede Section 20.002, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, to the extent of any conflict.
 (c)  Notwithstanding the repeal by this Act of Section
 20.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, if the Supreme Court of
 Texas does not adopt the rules described by Section 1 of this Act
 before September 1, 2025, the substance of Section 20.002, Civil
 Practice and Remedies Code, as that section existed immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, is continued in effect.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *