By: Cook, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3929 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2023; May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the adoption by the Supreme Court of Texas of the Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery Act. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Before September 1, 2025, the Supreme Court of Texas may adopt the Uniform Interstate Depositions and Discovery Act as rules of civil procedure. SECTION 2. (a) Effective September 1, 2025, Section 20.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is repealed. (b) If the Supreme Court of Texas adopts the rules described by Section 1 of this Act with an effective date before September 1, 2025, those rules supersede Section 20.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, to the extent of any conflict. (c) Notwithstanding the repeal by this Act of Section 20.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, if the Supreme Court of Texas does not adopt the rules described by Section 1 of this Act before September 1, 2025, the substance of Section 20.002, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, as that section existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, is continued in effect. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *