Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3991 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/23/2023

                    By: Isaac, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado) H.B. No. 3991
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
 May 11, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 23, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 13, Nays 0; May 23, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to Texas Fruit and Vegetable Day in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.9073 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.9073.  TEXAS FRUIT AND VEGETABLE DAY. (a)  The first
 Friday in April is designated Texas Fruit and Vegetable Day in
 public schools to promote awareness of the health benefits of
 fruits and vegetables and to encourage students to consume more
 fruits and vegetables during Texas Fruit and Vegetable Month under
 Section 662.103, Government Code.
 (b)  Texas Fruit and Vegetable Day shall include appropriate
 instruction, as determined by each school district.
 (c)  The agency may collaborate with other state agencies to
 promote Texas Fruit and Vegetable Day.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2023-2024
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *