Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4015 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/08/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Thompson of Brazoria (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 4015
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 8, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 16,
 Nays 0; May 8, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposition of certain fees collected for the rail
 safety program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.101(e), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  A fee collected under this section shall be deposited to
 the credit of the state highway fund and may be used only [general
 revenue fund to be used] for the rail safety program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *