Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4087 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 4087
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2023;
 May 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 1; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain on-site sewage disposal systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 366.012(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  To assure the effective and efficient administration of
 this chapter, the commission shall:
 (1)  adopt rules governing the installation of on-site
 sewage disposal systems, including rules concerning the:
 (A)  review and approval of on-site sewage
 disposal systems; and
 (B)  temporary waiver of a permit for an emergency
 repair; and
 (2)  adopt rules under this chapter that:
 (A)  encourage the use of economically feasible
 alternative techniques and technologies for on-site sewage
 disposal systems that can be used in soils not suitable for
 conventional on-site sewage disposal;
 (B)  address the separation of graywater, as
 defined by Section 341.039, in a residence served by an on-site
 sewage disposal system;
 (C)  allow for an adjustment in the size required
 of an on-site sewage disposal system if the system is used in
 conjunction with a graywater system that complies with the rules
 adopted under Section 341.039; [and]
 (D)  require on-site sewage disposal systems,
 including risers and covers, installed after September 1, 2012, to
 be designed to prevent access to the system by anyone other than:
 (i)  the owner of the system; or
 (ii)  a person described by Section
 366.071(a) or (b); and
 (E)  for a county with a population of at least
 350,000 and not more than 370,000 that is adjacent to the Gulf of
 Mexico and adjacent to a county with a population of at least 3.3
 million, allow for the installation of aerobic drip emitter systems
 on subdivided or platted properties less than one-half acre in size
 serving single-family residences supplied by a public drinking
 water system if site-specific planning materials have been:
 (i)  submitted by a licensed engineer or
 registered sanitarian; and
 (ii)  approved by the appropriate authorized
 agent.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 366, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 366.0513 to read as follows:
 Sec. 366.0513.  PERMITS FOR CERTAIN TEMPORARY SYSTEMS. (a)
 An authorized agent may issue a permit to authorize the use of a
 temporary on-site sewage disposal system that:
 (1)  operates in conjunction with the pumping and
 hauling of wastewater produced by the system; and
 (2)  serves a property that:
 (A)  has been subdivided for residential use; and
 (B)  is of insufficient size to accommodate
 on-site disposal of all wastewater in compliance with this chapter.
 (b)  A permit issued under this section:
 (1)  may authorize the use of a system and the
 associated pumping and hauling activities described by Subsection
 (a) for not more than six months from the date of issuance; and
 (2)  may not be renewed.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality shall
 adopt rules in accordance with Section 366.012(a), Health and
 Safety Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  Section 366.0513, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to an application for the issuance
 of a permit for an on-site sewage facility submitted on or after the
 effective date of this Act. An application submitted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date that application was submitted, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *