Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4122 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 4122
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operation and movement of motorcycles on a roadway
 laned for traffic.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 545, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 545.0605 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.0605.  OPERATION OF MOTORCYCLES ON ROADWAY LANED
 FOR TRAFFIC. (a) The operator of a motorcycle:
 (1)  is entitled to full use of a lane and, except as
 otherwise provided by Subdivision (2), a motor vehicle may not be
 driven in a manner that deprives a motorcycle of the full use of a
 lane;
 (2)  may operate the motorcycle two abreast in a single
 lane with another motorcycle; and
 (3)  may not;
 (A)  operate the motorcycle more than two abreast
 in a single lane with other motorcycles;
 (B)  operate the motorcycle between lanes of
 traffic moving in the same direction; or
 (C)  pass a motor vehicle while in the same lane as
 the vehicle being passed.
 (b)  Subsection (a)(3) does not apply to a police officer in
 the performance of the officer's official duties.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *