Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4166 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/11/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Klick (Senate Sponsor - Sparks) H.B. No. 4166
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 11, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 KolkhorstX
 PerryX
 BlancoX
 HallX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 LaMantiaX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the packaging requirements for certain donated
 prescription drugs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 442.053(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A donated prescription drug may be accepted or dispensed
 under this chapter only if the drug is in its original, unopened,
 sealed, and tamper-evident bottle, container, or unit-dose
 packaging.  A drug packaged in single unit doses may be accepted and
 dispensed if the outside packaging is opened but the single
 unit-dose packaging is unopened.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *