Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB422 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: VanDeaver, Burns, Cain H.B. No. 422
 (Senate Sponsor - Perry)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2023;
 May 2, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 17, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 422 By:  Hinojosa


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 WhitmireX
 FloresX
 BettencourtX
 HinojosaX
 HuffmanX
 KingX
 MilesX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to remotely conducting detention hearings in juvenile
 cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 54.012, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.012.  REMOTE CONDUCT [INTERACTIVE VIDEO RECORDING]
 OF DETENTION HEARING.
 SECTION 2.  Section 54.012, Family Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1), (a-2), and
 (e) to read as follows:
 (a)  A detention hearing under Section 54.01 may be conducted
 as a remote proceeding [held using interactive video equipment]
 if[:
 [(1)  the child and the child's attorney agree to the
 video hearing; and
 [(2)]  the parties to the proceeding have the
 opportunity to cross-examine witnesses.  Consent of the parties is
 not required for the detention hearing to be held in the manner
 specified by this subsection unless the United States or Texas
 Constitution requires consent.
 (a-1)  A juvenile court may allow or require a party,
 attorney, witness, court reporter, or any other individual to
 participate in a detention hearing conducted as a remote
 proceeding.
 (a-2)  The judge of a juvenile court shall submit to the
 Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial System a plan
 for conducting a detention hearing as a remote proceeding under
 this section.  The plan must:
 (1)  include protocols for handling physical evidence;
 and
 (2)  require an unobstructed view of any party or
 witness who provides testimony from a remote location.
 (e)  In this section, "remote proceeding" means a proceeding
 in which one or more of the participants, including a judge, party,
 attorney, witness, court reporter, or other individual, attends the
 proceeding remotely through the use of technology and the Internet,
 including through teleconferencing or videoconferencing.
 SECTION 3.  Section 54.012(b), Family Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *