Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB423 Fiscal Note / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/13/2023

                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD     Austin, Texas       FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION             March 13, 2023       TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB423 by Lopez, Ray (Relating to a study regarding the cost of child care in this state in comparison to wages.), As Introduced     Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB423, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($1,287,420) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact toGeneral Revenue Related Funds2024($1,225,963)2025($61,457)2026$02027$02028$0All Funds, Five-Year Impact: Fiscal Year Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1 Probable (Cost) fromGR Match For Medicaid758 Probable (Cost) fromFederal Funds555 Change in Number of State Employees from FY 20232024($825,000)($400,963)($400,963)1.02025$0($61,457)($61,457)1.02026$0$0$00.02027$0$0$00.02028$0$0$00.0 Fiscal AnalysisThe bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to conduct a study on the cost of child care in the state in comparison to wages, with the assistance of the Texas Workforce Commission. The bill would take effect September 1, 2023, and expire on September 1, 2025.

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 88TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 13, 2023

 

 

  TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services     FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board      IN RE: HB423 by Lopez, Ray (Relating to a study regarding the cost of child care in this state in comparison to wages.), As Introduced   

TO: Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services
FROM: Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB423 by Lopez, Ray (Relating to a study regarding the cost of child care in this state in comparison to wages.), As Introduced

 Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services

 Honorable James B. Frank, Chair, House Committee on Human Services

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 Jerry McGinty, Director, Legislative Budget Board 

 HB423 by Lopez, Ray (Relating to a study regarding the cost of child care in this state in comparison to wages.), As Introduced 

 HB423 by Lopez, Ray (Relating to a study regarding the cost of child care in this state in comparison to wages.), As Introduced 



Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB423, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($1,287,420) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB423, As Introduced : a negative impact of ($1,287,420) through the biennium ending August 31, 2025. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five- Year Impact: 


2024 ($1,225,963)
2025 ($61,457)
2026 $0
2027 $0
2028 $0

All Funds, Five-Year Impact: 


2024 ($825,000) ($400,963) ($400,963) 1.0
2025 $0 ($61,457) ($61,457) 1.0
2026 $0 $0 $0 0.0
2027 $0 $0 $0 0.0
2028 $0 $0 $0 0.0

 Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC) to conduct a study on the cost of child care in the state in comparison to wages, with the assistance of the Texas Workforce Commission. The bill would take effect September 1, 2023, and expire on September 1, 2025.

 Methodology

According to information provided by HHSC, additional staff and resources would be needed to conduct the study, as HHSC does not have the data nor oversight into the subject matter required to conduct the study. This analysis assumes HHSC would contract with an entity to complete the study at a cost of $1.5 million in All Funds, and hire 1.0 Contract Specialist V for contract oversight. The total estimated cost in All Funds to hire the 1.0 full-time-equivalent (FTE), including other personnel related costs, would be $0.2 million in All Funds in fiscal years 2024 through 2025. It is assumed that any fiscal impact to the Texas Workforce Commission can be absorbed within existing resources.

 Technology

This analysis assumes there would be FTE related technology costs, including seat management services and basic data storage. The total estimated cost in All Funds would be $3,214 in fiscal year 2024 and $524 in fiscal year 2025.

This analysis assumes there would be FTE related technology costs, including seat management services and basic data storage. The total estimated cost in All Funds would be $3,214 in fiscal year 2024 and $524 in fiscal year 2025.



 Local Government Impact

No significant fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: b > td > 320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

320 Texas Workforce Commission, 529 Health and Human Services Commission

LBB Staff: b > td > JMc, NPe, ER, SB, NV, LBl

JMc, NPe, ER, SB, NV, LBl