By: Garcia, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4333 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023; May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the extension of a family violence pretrial diversion pilot program in Bexar County. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 509.018(e), Government Code, is amended to read as follows: (e) This section expires September 1, 2027 [2023]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2023. * * * * *