Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4333 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2023

                    By: Garcia, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 4333
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 1, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 16, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 16, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the extension of a family violence pretrial diversion
 pilot program in Bexar County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 509.018(e), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *